Simmons v. Dorchester County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Simmons
Defendant: Dorchester County Detention Center, Summerville Police Department, John Does 1-10, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight, South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense and Town of Summerville
Case Number: 2:2019cv00425
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Response to Motion due by 4/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit SLED Background Check, #3 Exhibit Inmate Report)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Ganes, Elloree)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense.(Ganes, Elloree)
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Town of Summerville.(Butler, Drew)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Dorchester County Detention Center, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight.(Cooper, G)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. See Court Docket Nos. 14 and 15. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 03/20/2019. (egra, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/10/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/24/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/24/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/15/2019, Discovery due by 8/15/2019, Motions due by 10/16/2019, Mediation Due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 03/20/2019. (egra, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dorchester County Detention Center, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight, John Does 1-10, South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense, filed by Stanley Simmons. Service due by 6/17/2019 (McCumber, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Counsel for the Plaintiff. (McCumber, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense.(Ganes, Elloree)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense.(Ganes, Elloree)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dorchester County Detention Center, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight.(Cooper, G) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/20/2019) (egra, ). (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/20/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct case number on document as verified by filing user (egra, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dorchester County Detention Center, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight.(Cooper, G) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/20/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct case number on document as provided by filing user (egra, ).
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Simmons. Summerville Police Department served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Tracking Form) (McCumber, Andrew) (egra, ) Modified on 3/8/2019 to correct event type(egra, ).
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Simmons. Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Returned Receipt, #2 Tracking Form) (McCumber, Andrew) (egra, ) Refiled to correct event type Modified on 3/11/2019 to edit serve date (egra, ).
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Simmons. Dorchester County Detention Center served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Returned Receipt, #2 Tracking Form) (McCumber, Andrew) (egra, ) Refiled to correct event type Modified on 3/11/2019 to edit serve date (egra, ).
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Summerville Police Department.(Butler, Drew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Summerville Police Department. Response to Motion due by 3/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Butler, Drew)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stanley Simmons. (egra, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dorchester County Detention Center, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight, South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense, Summerville Police Department. Service due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Dorchester County Sheriff LC Knight, #2 Summons - SCCID, #3 Summons- Summerville Police Dept) (egra, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dorchester County Detention Center, Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight, John Does 1-10, South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense, Summerville Police Department ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8269196.), filed by Stanley Simmons. Service due by 5/14/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Dorchester County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Simmons
Represented By: Christopher W Burrows
Represented By: Andrew J McCumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorchester County Detention Center
Represented By: Henry Lucius Laffitte, III
Represented By: G Wade Cooper
Represented By: Hugh Willcox Buyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerville Police Department
Represented By: John Horton Guerry
Represented By: Drew Hamilton Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorchester County Sheriff L.C. Knight
Represented By: Henry Lucius Laffitte, III
Represented By: G Wade Cooper
Represented By: Hugh Willcox Buyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense and Office of Indigent Defense
Represented By: Alyssa Louise Agostino
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Summerville
Represented By: John Horton Guerry
Represented By: Drew Hamilton Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?