Koola v. Ditech Financial LLC
Appellee: Ditech Financial LLC
Appellant: Johnson D Koola
Trustee: U.S. Bank Trust
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 2:2019cv00429
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bratton Varnado on behalf of Johnson D Koola (Varnado, Robert) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/12/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 4/12/2019 to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user (egra, ).
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 Transcript of Bankruptcy Proceedings Confirmation, Motion for New Trial, Confirmation, Objection to Mortgage Claim-Motion for Disallowance of Claim on 11-2-18,11-14-18,1-17-19,1-31-19, before Judge Waites, re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Transcript may be viewed via the Bankruptcy docket or at the Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Transcipts of Hearings Held 11-2-18,11-14-18-1-17-19 and 1-31-19)(kdouglass-USBK, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order - Bankruptcy Appeal, placed in U.S. Mail to Johnson D Koola 1587 Cambridge Lakes Dr. Mt Pleasant, SC 29464. (egra, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The Court orders the parties to file briefs. Appellant shall serve and file his brief within thirty (30) days from the date this order is entered. Appellee shall serve and file its brief within thirty (30) days after the service of Appellant's brief. Appellant shall serve and file any rely brief within fourteen (14) days after the service of the Appellee's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 03/27/2019. (egra, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATED RECORD(BANKRUPTCY) by Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Record for Appeal - Part 1, #2 Docket Sheet and Record for Appeal - Part 2, #3 Docket Sheet and Record for Appeal - Part 3, #4 Docket Sheet and Record for Appeal - Part 4)(kdouglass-USBK, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Charleston Division. Koola v. Ditech Financial LLC and US Bank Trust as Trustee for LSF 10 Master Participation Trust (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Transmittal of Amended Notice of Appeal)(kdouglass-USBK, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01373-JW., filed by Johnson D Koola. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koola v. Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Jason David Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Johnson D Koola
Represented By: Robert Bratton Varnado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Bank Trust
Represented By: Brian A Calub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?