Darnell Brown v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Brown
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections and Warden Aaron Joyner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00572
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 86 TEXT ORDER re #85 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance. The undersigned grants protection to Attorney David Cornwell Holler for the following time period: April 20-May 6, 2019. This Order does not afford protection from any appearance required before the District Court Judge assigned to this case, although he may separately grant such protection. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 4/2/19. (akob, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by David Cornwell Holler for 04/20/19 - 05/06/19 (Holler, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 84 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Darnell Brown(Bell, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 83 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections(Holler, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER: Case was severed from 2:18-cv-00719-TMC-MGB. (hada, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER adopting in part #57 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' #24 Summary Judgment Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted only as to Plaintiff Jabari Moore's claims brought under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Accordingly, Plaintiff Moore's federal claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff Moore's remaining state law claims are REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas of Lee County, South Carolina. Additionally, the court finds that the remaining Plaintiffs' claims should be SEVERED into separate actions. Plaintiff Battle will continue under the instant civil action number. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign new civil action numbers to each of the other individual Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 02/26/2019.(hada, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Holler, David)
January 22, 2019 Filing 79 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Expert Report)(Bell, James)
January 9, 2019 Filing 78 TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the court is considering entering an order severing the claims in this case. Rule 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provides that the court "[o]n motion or on its own" may at any time add or drop a party or sever any claim against a party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 21; see also Media Prods. Inc. v. Does 1-58, No. JFM-12-0348, 2012 WL 1150816 (D. Md. Apr. 4, 2012) (holding that, pursuant to Rule 21, a court may at any time, upon motion or sua sponte, dismiss a misjoined party or sever a misjoined claim). Accordingly, the parties are granted until January 24, 2019, to show cause why the court should not sever these claims under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/9/19. (kmca)
January 2, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore to #68 Objection to Report and Recommendation, . (Bell, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 76 TEXT ORDER re #71 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance. The undersigned grants protection to Attorney David C. Holler for the following time period: December 28, 2018 through February 18, 2019. This Order does not afford protection from any appearance required before the District Court Judge assigned to this case, although he may separately grant such protection. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/21/18.(akob, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 75 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #62 Motion for Reconsideration. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/21/18.(akob, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REFERENCE #73 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/20/2018. (hada, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. Discovery due by 3/11/2019, Motions due by 5/6/2019, Mediation Due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/20/2018. (hada, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed amended schedule order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
December 20, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by David Cornwell Holler for 12/28/18 - 2/18/19 (Holler, David)
November 20, 2018 Filing 70 TEXT ORDER granting #69 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall have until January 2, 2019, to file a response to Defendants' Objections [ECF NO. 68] to the Report and Recommnendation [ECF NO. 57]. Signed by Honorable Timothy M. Cain on 11/20/2018.(vmcd, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Objections to the Report and Reccomendation by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bell, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 68 OBJECTION to #57 Report and Recommendation by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Reply to Objections due by 11/29/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Holler, David)
November 12, 2018 Filing 67 DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Holler, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 66 TEXT ORDER. The parties have communicated to the Court that no further briefing is needed on Jabari Moore. Because it appears there is no evidence that would support finding Mr. Moore's administrative remedies were unavailable with respect to the claims in this action, the Court recommends Defendant's #24 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted as to Jabari Moore for failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. In making this recommendation, the Court incorporates its findings made in its October 2, 2018 #57 Order. Accordingly, Mr. Moore's claims should be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/26/18. (akob, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 63 TEXT ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' objection to #57 R&R due by November 16, 2018. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/11/18.(kmca)
October 11, 2018 Filing 62 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 58 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, Order on Motion to Sever, by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Object to #57 R&R by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 10/24/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. (Holler, David) Modified to edit text as motion is no longer referred on 10/10/2018 (ssam, ). (Main Document 60 replaced on 10/11/2018: to correct case number - Judge's initials. PLEASE NOTE CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER FILED 9/6/18 [ECF DOC 48]). Modified on 10/11/2018: to add link to #57 R&R (kmca).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REFERENCE #57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #46 Motion for Extension of Time; denying without prejudice #23 Motion to Sever. The deadlines in the Amended Scheduling Order are extended by two months. Accordingly, discovery on the merits is due by January 9, 2018, motions are due by March 8, 2019, and mediation is due by February 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/1/2018.(ssam, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 57 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment/Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Stay Discovery (Dkt. No. #24 ) be DENIED IN PART. Specifically, it is recommended that summary judgment be denied as to Plaintiffs Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffrey Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, and John Mack; and that discovery on the issue of exhaustion as to Plaintiff Jabari Moore be allowed for an additional 20 days before making a final recommendation on summary judgment as to Jabari Moore. Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/1/2018. (ssam, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 First MOTION to Sever , #46 Third MOTION for Extension of Time of remaining deadlines in ECF-29 pending ruling on ECF 23 and ECF 24 (requests for stay), #24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay Response filed by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Holler, David)
September 25, 2018 Filing 55 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2018. Gabby Sulpizio, Ed Bell, III, and David Holler present on call. Court Reporter Debbie Potocki. (hhil, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 Third MOTION for Extension of Time of remaining deadlines in ECF-29 pending ruling on ECF 23 and ECF 24 (requests for stay) Response filed by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/25/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bell, James)
September 17, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/25/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Defendants have requested an "administrative hearing to determine any dispute of fact" regarding whether Plaintiffs have exhausted their administrative remedies with respect to this action. (Dkt No. 24-1 at 9.) The noticed hearing is limited in scope to address only this specific issue. The Court will contact the parties to provide dial in information for the hearing.(ssam, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit S Anderson, #2 Affidavit T Hiott, #3 Affidavit J Kenealy)(Holler, David)
September 10, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Telephonic Hearing set for 9/11/2018 10:00 AM. Hearing to be rescheduled at a later date. (ssam, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay Response filed by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Anderson on Battle affidavit, #2 Affidavit Anderson on D Brown affidavit, #3 Affidavit Anderson on Drake affidavit, #4 Affidavit Anderson on J Brown affidavit, #5 Affidavit Anderson on Lyles affidavit, #6 Affidavit Anderson on Mack affidavit, #7 Affidavit Anderson on Moore affidavit, #8 Exhibit RTSM policy GA 06-04)(Holler, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). (Attachment 7 replaced on 9/7/2018) (ssam, ). Modified to replace documents with corrected versions provided by filing user on 9/7/2018 (ssam, ).
September 6, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:18-cv-00719-AMQ-MGB to 2:18-cv-00719-TMC-MGB. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (ssam, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 47 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Timothy M Cain. Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 46 Third MOTION for Extension of Time of remaining deadlines in ECF-29 pending ruling on ECF 23 and ECF 24 (requests for stay) by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Hearing set for 9/11/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Defendants have requested an "administrative hearing to determine any dispute of fact" regarding whether Plaintiffs have exhausted their administrative remedies with respect to this action. (Dkt No. 24-1 at 9.) The noticed hearing is limited in scope to address only this specific issue. The Court will contact the parties to provide dial in information for the hearing.(ssam, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 44 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report and CV)(Bell, James)
July 30, 2018 Filing 43 Additional Attachments to Main Document #34 Response in Opposition to Motion. First attachment description: Affidavit of Korell Battle. (Bell, James) Filing corrected for event type. (ssam, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' time to file a Reply as to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition (Dkt. No. #34 ) to the Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. #24 ) is hereby extended to 9/6/2018. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 7/30/2018.(arog, ) Modified to add TEXT on 7/30/2018 (ssam, ).
July 27, 2018 Filing 40 Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #37 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 7/20/2018.(ssam, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 First MOTION to Sever Response filed by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brooks, et al v SCDC decision)(Holler, David)
July 11, 2018 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David) (Main Document 37 replaced on 7/11/2018) (ssam, ). Modified to replace document with corrected document provided by filing user on 7/11/2018 (ssam, ). (Main Document 37 replaced on 7/16/2018) (ssam, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2018: #1 Proposed Order) (ssam, ). Modified to add motion as main document as provided by filing user and re-file proposed order as the first attachment on 7/16/2018 (ssam, ). (Main Document 37 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 7/19/2018) (ssam, ). (Additional attachment(s) added as provided by filing user on 7/19/2018: #2 Confidentiality Order - redlined copy) (ssam, ). Modified on 7/19/2018 (ssam, ).
July 3, 2018 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay. Defendants' time to file a Reply as to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition (Dkt. No. 34) to the Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 24) is hereby extended to 8/6/2018. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 7/3/2018.(arog, )
July 2, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
June 28, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay Response filed by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/5/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Greivance Policy, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Jim Aiken, #3 Exhibit Rodriquez Case, #4 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit- Drake, #5 Exhibit Affidavit Drake, #6 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit J. Brown, #7 Exhibit Affidavit J. Brown, #8 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit D. Brown, #9 Exhibit Affidavit D. Brown, #10 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit Battle, #11 Exhibit Affidavit Vicki Knight, #12 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit Mack, #13 Exhibit Affidavit Mack, #14 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit Moore, #15 Exhibit Affidavit Moore, #16 Exhibit Anderson Affidavit Lyles, #17 Exhibit Affidavit Lyles)(Bell, James) Modified to add #43 additional attachment on 7/30/2018 (ssam, ).
June 18, 2018 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' time to file a Reply to the Response in Opposition to the Motion to Sever (Dkt. No. 23) is hereby extended to July 16, 2018. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/18/2018.(arog, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 31 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REFERENCE #29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/12/2018.(ssam, )
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/10/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/10/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/10/2018, Discovery due by 11/9/2018, Motions due by 1/8/2019, Mediation Due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/12/2018. (ssam, )
June 8, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 First MOTION to Sever and Stay Discovery on the Merits Response filed by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/15/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bell, James)
June 8, 2018 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Identify Expert Witnesses by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore. Response to Motion due by 6/22/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bell, James)
June 4, 2018 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay. Plaintiffs' time to respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment/Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 24) is hereby extended to 6/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/4/2018.(arog, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John Mack, Jabari Moore. Response to Motion due by 6/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bell, James)
May 25, 2018 Filing 24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment/MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay Discovery by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - Battle, #3 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - D. Brown, #4 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - Drake, #5 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - J. Brown, #6 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - Lyles, #7 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - Mack, #8 Affidavit of Sherman Anderson - Moore, #9 Exhibit SCDC Grievance Policy)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 5/29/2018 (ssam, ).
May 25, 2018 Filing 23 First MOTION to Sever by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 6/8/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
May 25, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Holler, David)
May 17, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John W Mack, Darnell Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, Korell Battle, Jabari Moore, Jeffery Brown. Service due by 8/15/2018 (Bell, James)
May 17, 2018 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs may file their Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 18-1) on or before May 24, 2018. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 5/17/2018.(arog, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John W Mack, Jabari Moore. Response to Motion due by 5/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bell, James)
April 24, 2018 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER denying #13 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. This motion is denied because the proposed amended scheduling order is no sufficient. The parties are free to file another motion with a complete proposed amended scheduling order that accounts for all relevant deadlines through dispositive motions and mediation. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on April 24, 2018.(mozm, )
April 22, 2018 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John W Mack, Jabari Moore.(Bell, James)
April 20, 2018 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Holler, David)
April 20, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Scheduling Order,, by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John W Mack, Jabari Moore. Response to Motion due by 5/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bell, James)
April 20, 2018 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John W Mack, Jabari Moore.(Bell, James)
April 11, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Korell Battle, Darnell Brown, Jeffery Brown, Ronnie Drake, Lance Lyles, John W Mack, Jabari Moore.(Bell, James)
April 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:18-cv-00719-TMC-MGB to 2:18-cv-00719-AMQ-MGB. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (ssam, )
April 10, 2018 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr. Judge Honorable Timothy M Cain no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:18-cv-00719-PMD-MGB to 2:18-cv-00719-TMC-MGB. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (ssam, )
March 28, 2018 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Honorable Timothy M. Cain. Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/6/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/20/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 4/20/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/11/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/11/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/11/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/11/2018, Discovery due by 9/10/2018, Motions due by 11/9/2018, Mediation Due by 10/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 3/16/2018. (ssam, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections. (ssam, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (ssam, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aaron Joyner, Cecilia Reynolds, South Carolina Department of Corrections.(ssam, ) Modified to add filer listed on document on 3/16/2018 (ssam, ).
March 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-31-00039. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7667088), filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections, Aaron Joyner. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(ssam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnell Brown v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Brown
Represented By: Victoria S H Knight
Represented By: Gabrielle Anna Sulpizio
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Cecilia Reynolds
Represented By: David Cornwell Holler
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: David Cornwell Holler
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Aaron Joyner
Represented By: David Cornwell Holler
Represented By: G Murrell Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?