Guinn v. Allura USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shara Guinn
Defendant: Plycem USA Inc, Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA LLC, Elementia USA Inc and Elementia SA de CV
Case Number: 2:2019cv00978
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Shara Guinn. Response to Motion due by 4/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cash, III, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00858. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 #15 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Leah Greenberg Katz and Anthony Vale. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN036324 RE #14 and #15 (jlw) Modified docket text on 3/20/2019 (sct). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 4/5/2019 to File Responses re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/15/2019. (km) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss, #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) New date requested 4/5/2019. by Plaintiff SHARA GUINN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' consent to extension) (Cash, III, William) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Anthony C. H. Vale by Defendants ALLURA USA LLC, ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Anthony C. H. Vale, #2 Exhibit A) (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Leah Greenberg Katz by Defendants ALLURA USA LLC, ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Leah Greenberg Katz, #2 Exhibit A) (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Defendants ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC of Filing of Corrected Declaration (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit B - Marin Declaration) (Stubblefield, Amanda) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC. (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss by Defendants ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC. (Burke, James). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 2/25/2019 (sct). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction) by Defendant ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Presley v. JP/Politikens Hus (unpublished)) (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Defendants ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC of Filing of Declarations and Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Maxitile Limited Warranty, #2 Exhibit 2 - Allura Limited Warranty, #3 Exhibit A - Kramer Declaration, #4 Exhibit B - Marin Declaration, #5 Exhibit C - Herrington Declaration) (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: ALLURA USA LLC answer due 2/22/2019; ELEMENTIA USA, INC. answer due 2/22/2019; ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V. answer due 2/22/2019; PLYCEM USA LLC answer due 2/22/2019; PLYCEM USA, INC. answer due 2/22/2019. (km) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Until 2/22/2019 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/7/2019. (km) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants ALLURA USA LLC, ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA, INC.. (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/22/2019. by Defendants ALLURA USA LLC, ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Burke, James) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eugene Burke and Amanda Stubblefield for Defendants ALLURA USA LLC, ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA, INC. (Burke, James) Modified text to include additional attorney name on 2/7/2019 (mr). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V. on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Cash, III, William) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to ELEMENTIA USA, INC. on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Cash, III, William) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to PLYCEM USA LLC on 12/12/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (Cash, III, William) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlot REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
December 6, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against ALLURA USA LLC, ELEMENTIA USA, INC., ELEMENTIA, S.A. DE C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6703892), filed by SHARA GUINN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cash, III, William) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinn v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA Inc
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA Inc
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia SA de CV
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Stubblefield
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: James Eugene Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shara Guinn
Represented By: William Franklin Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?