Friday v. Allura USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: John W. Friday
Defendant: Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC, Elementia USA Inc and Elementia S.A.B. de C.V.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01037
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE to Attorneys regarding MDL Transfer (jbry, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:18-cv-02701. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 TRANSFER ORDER. (MDL 2886) Signed by deputy clerk on 4/8/2019. (ydm) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for extension of time for Plaintiff to File a Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff John W. Friday (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Boswell, Brittany) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Status Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM (central time) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. (mn) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #14 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline extended to 4/8/2019. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 03/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defentants' Motions to Dismiss as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (mn) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defentants' Motions to Dismiss as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff John W. Friday (Boswell, Brittany) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. A--Herrington Declaration)(Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Defendants Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. A--Herrington Declaration)(Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Defendants Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. A--Kramer Declaration)(Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V. (Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC identifying Elementia S.A.B. de C.V. as corporate parent (Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants Elementia USA, Inc. and Elementia S.A.B. de C.V. are granted a 24-day extension of time, to and including February 25, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Elementia S.A.B. De. C.V., Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plycem USA LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant Plycem USA LLC is granted a 45-day extension of time, to and including February 25, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
January 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Plycem USA LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Keatley, Edward) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell M. Breit for John W. Friday pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/20/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Mitchell M. Breit to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4666384.) by Plaintiff John W. Friday (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Boswell, Brittany) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allura USA LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff John W. Friday - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Boswell, Brittany) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John W. Friday. (Boswell, Brittany) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4665134.), filed by John W. Friday.(Boswell, Brittany) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friday v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Represented By: Amy D. Fitts
Represented By: Edward Benton Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA Inc
Represented By: Amy D. Fitts
Represented By: Edward Benton Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia S.A.B. de C.V.
Represented By: Amy D. Fitts
Represented By: Edward Benton Keatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Friday
Represented By: Mitchell M Breit
Represented By: Brittany A. Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?