Braun-Hoover v. Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc
Plaintiff: Janice K Braun-Hoover
Defendant: Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01295
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/13/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/12/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/15/2019, Discovery due by 12/16/2019, Motions due by 2/14/2020, Mediation Due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/18/2019. (hada, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc.(Wofford, Penny)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc.(Wofford, Penny)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janice K Braun-Hoover. Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Potts, A)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc. (hada, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Janice K Braun-Hoover.(hada, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8423992.), filed by Janice K Braun-Hoover. Service due by 8/1/2019(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun-Hoover v. Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance America Cash Advance Centers of South Carolina Inc
Represented By: Penny Correll Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice K Braun-Hoover
Represented By: A Christopher Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?