Bonitz Flooring Group Inc v. ML Builders LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bonitz Flooring Group Inc
Defendant: ML Builders LLC and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01309
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Bonitz Flooring Group Inc. (Smith, Franklin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonitz Flooring Group Inc. ML Builders LLC served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on ML Builders, LLC)(Smith, Franklin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Bonitz Flooring Group Inc. Western Surety Company served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SC Dept. of Insurance Acceptance of Service for Western Surety Co.)(Smith, Franklin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bonitz Flooring Group Inc.(sshe, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8426473.), filed by Bonitz Flooring Group Inc. Service due by 8/5/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonitz Flooring Group Inc v. ML Builders LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML Builders LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonitz Flooring Group Inc
Represented By: Franklin J Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?