Williams v. Vacations International Club LLC et al

Plaintiff: Clayton Williams
Defendant: Vacations International Club LLC and Does 1 - 25 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01364
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Clayton Williams.(Toporek, Alan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Williams. Vacations International Club LLC served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019.(Knowles, Brian) Filing corrected for event type. (sshe, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Does 1 - 25 Inclusive, Vacations International Club LLC. (sshe, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Clayton Williams.(sshe, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8436377.), filed by Clayton Williams. Service due by 8/7/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Vacations International Club LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacations International Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 25 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Williams
Represented By: Robert Marc Turkewitz
Represented By: Steven M Abrams
Represented By: Brian Morris Knowles
Represented By: Alan David Toporek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?