Oppenheimer v. Pearce et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Apex Media Corporation and Gregory D Pearce
Case Number: 2:2019cv01384
Filed: May 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer (Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/8/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 7/8/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Apex Media Corporation served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/8/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 7/8/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Gregory D Pearce served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/8/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 7/8/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 8 and 9 Reason: The above document was a proposed summons should have been emailed to the clerk's office and not filed. Corrected Filing Document Number #10 (jbry, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Apex Media Corporation, Gregory D Pearce. (jbry, )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion by Dana Andrew LeJune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/21/2019.(jbry, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dana Andrew LeJune ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8454854) by David Oppenheimer. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing LeJune, #2 Pro hac vice application, #3 Proposed Order Proposed order).(Allen, Samuel) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/22/2019) (jbry, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/22/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 5/22/2019 to correct case number on documents, make motion in support the main document and the application an attachment, and to edit docket text (jbry, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #4 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to Copyright Office (jbry, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (jbry, )
May 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Oppenheimer.(jbry, )
May 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8438433.), filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 8/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Work, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - URL, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Articles of Incorporation, #6 Notice of Lawsuit and proposed waivers)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Pearce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Samuel K Allen
Represented By: Dana Andrew Lejune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?