Rosell v. BAH Shoney's Corp. et al

Plaintiff: David S. Rosell
Defendant: BAH Shoney's Corp., Shoney's South Carolina, LLC and Best American Hospitality Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01479
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by BAH Shoney's Corp.. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Crotty, Cara)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BAH Shoney's Corp..(Crotty, Cara)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BAH Shoney's Corp..(Crotty, Cara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Shoney's South Carolina, LLC by David S. Rosell. (Tong, Emily)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David S. Rosell. BAH Shoney's Corp. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Shoney's South Carolina, LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service BAH Shoney's Corp, et al, #2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service Shoney's South Carolina, LLC)(Tong, Emily)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BAH Shoney's Corp., Shoney's South Carolina, LLC. Service due by 8/19/2019. (egra, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David S. Rosell. (egra, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/21/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 5/21/2019 to correct case number (egra, ).
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BAH Shoney's Corp., Shoney's South Carolina, LLC. Service due by 8/19/2019. (egra, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAH Shoney's Corp., Shoney's South Carolina, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8457289.), filed by David S. Rosell. Service due by 8/19/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosell v. BAH Shoney's Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAH Shoney's Corp.
Represented By: Cara Y Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoney's South Carolina, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best American Hospitality Corp.
Represented By: Cara Y Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Rosell
Represented By: Emily Hanewicz Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?