Whittington v. GCA Education Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Whittington
Defendant: GCA Education Services Inc. and GCA Services Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv01626
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/14/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/28/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/28/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/18/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/18/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/18/2019, Discovery due by 1/17/2020, Motions due by 3/17/2020, Mediation Due by 2/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/23/2019. (egra, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by GCA Education Services Inc..(Roth, Jonathan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GCA Education Services Inc..(Roth, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER GCA Services Group answer due 7/22/2019; GCA Education Services Inc. answer due 7/22/2019. (Lewis, Stephanie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey L. Whittington. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Potts, A)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeffrey L. Whittington. (egra, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GCA Education Services Inc., GCA Services Group. Service due by 9/3/2019. (egra, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GCA Education Services Inc., GCA Services Group ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8486909.), filed by Jeffrey L. Whittington. Service due by 9/3/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittington v. GCA Education Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Whittington
Represented By: A Christopher Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCA Education Services Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Represented By: Jonathan A Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCA Services Group
Represented By: Stephanie E Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?