Leaptech LLC v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc

Plaintiff: Leaptech LLC
Defendant: UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc and Partnership, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01650
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Withdrawal of Motions: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc.. (Bogdan, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc. (Bogdan, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss in Part Response filed by Partnership, LLC. (Anderson, Taniel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief Response filed by Leaptech LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Countryman, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bogdan, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by Leaptech LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/9/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Countryman, Andrew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss in Part Response filed by Leaptech LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terms and Conditions)(Countryman, Andrew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #8 MOTION to Dismiss in Part : Motion Hearing set for Monday, 8/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John Hughes, #2 Exhibit Bill of Lading, #3 Exhibit PartnerShip Transactional Pricing, #4 Exhibit PartnerShip Terms and Conditions, #5 Exhibit UPGF 102-L)(Bogdan, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bogdan, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss in Part by Partnership, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Anderson, Taniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Partnership, LLC identifying Other Affiliate National Association of College Stores, Inc. for Partnership, LLC.. (Anderson, Taniel)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until June 21, 2019 to file a response to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/12/2019.(jbry, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bogdan, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Leaptech LLC.(Countryman, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc.(jbry, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-02303. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8491589), filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit Service on UPS, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leaptech LLC v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Supply Chain Solutions Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Bogdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnership, LLC
Represented By: Taniel Ermano Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leaptech LLC
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?