SEVERANCE v. PLYCEM USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT SEVERANCE
Defendant: Elementia S.A.B. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc and Elementia USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01659
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER FOR THE PURPOSE OF MEDIATION ONLY Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/23/2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-mn-02886-DCN et al.(jbry, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00088. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) re MDL No. 2886 to District of South Carolina) (Attachments: #1 attachment) (atm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/10/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF TEXT ONLY ENTRY, MINUTE ORDER RE Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-54) Finalized on 5/29/19. Please see pleading (4 in FLN/1:19-cv-00088, 55 in MDL No. 2886). (atm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/10/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-3) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in FLN/1:19-cv-00088, 53 in MDL No. 2886) (atm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons) (atm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (atm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/10/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4489965.), filed by Robert Severance. (Attachments: #1 Flat - Elementia S.A.B. De C.V. (Summons), #2 Flat - Elementia USA Inc. (Summons), #3 Flat - Plycem USA Inc. (Summons), #4 Flat - Plycem USA LLC (Summons), #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (HARRIS, SCOTT) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEVERANCE v. PLYCEM USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia S.A.B. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SEVERANCE
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?