Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The v. Episcopal Church of the Redeemer et al
Plaintiff: Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The
Defendant: Church of the Holy Cross Stateburg SC, Church of the Cross, Holy Trinity Episcopal Church, Christ Church Mt. Pleasant, All Saints Protestant Episcopal Church Inc, St Michael's Episcopal Church, Episcopal Church of The Resurrection Surfside, The, Old St. Andrews Episcopal Church, Episcopal Church in South Carolina, The, St. Jude's Church, Episcopal Church of the Redeemer, Church of the Good Shepherd Charleston SC, The, St Philips Episcopal Church, St. Johns Episcopal Church, St. Bartholomews Episcopal Church, St. David Episcopal Church, Episcopal Church of our Savior, Episcopal Church of the Holy Comforter, St. David, Christ Episcopal, Parish of Saint Michael in Charleston in the State of South Carolina, Vestries and Churchwardens of the Parish of St. Andrews, Church Of The Resurrection, Church of the Redeemer, Vestry and Church Wardens of St. Jude, Church Of The Cross Inc and Church Of The Cross Declaration of Trust, Protestant Episcopal Church, St. Judes Episcopal Church, All Saints Episcopal Church, Protestant Episcopal Church of The Parish of Saint Phillip in Charleston in the State of South Carolina, Church of the Good Shepherd, Church Of The Holy Cross, St Michael, Episcopal Church of the Resurrection and Trinity Episcopal Church
Case Number: 2:2019cv01713
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed, #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Motion for Joinder filed ; Response to Motion due by 8/30/2019. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/26/2019.(ltap, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Motion for Joinder filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01672-RMG, 2:19-cv-01713-RMG(Pritchard, Edward)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01713-RMG, 2:19-cv-01672-RMG(Pritchard, Edward)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Filed, #10 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases Filed Response filed by Episcopal Church in South Carolina, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/25/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Tisdale, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Episcopal Church in South Carolina, The. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 LR 26.01 Answers)No proposed order.(Tisdale, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Episcopal Church in South Carolina, The. Episcopal Church in South Carolina, The served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Tisdale, Thomas)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases Filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Amended Memorandum in Support of Amended Motion of Plaintiff, The Church Insurance Company of Vermont, to Consolidate Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)(2))No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01713-RMG, 2:19-cv-01672-RMG(Pritchard, Edward)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Second Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The.(Pritchard, Edward)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The, filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The. Service due by 10/3/2019 (Pritchard, Edward)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont. Response to Motion due by 7/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion of Plaintiff, The Church Insurance Company of Vermont, to Consolidate Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)(2))No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01713-RMG, 2:19-cv-01672-RMG(Pritchard, Edward)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The. Service due by 9/25/2019. Filing corrected for event type choice re party filer against. (sshe, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The.(Pritchard, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The.(sshe, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8505459.), filed by Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The. Service due by 9/12/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The v. Episcopal Church of the Redeemer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of the Holy Cross Stateburg SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of the Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy Trinity Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christ Church Mt. Pleasant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Saints Protestant Episcopal Church Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Michael's Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church of The Resurrection Surfside, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old St. Andrews Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church in South Carolina, The
Represented By: Kathleen Fowler Monoc
Represented By: Thomas S Tisdale, Jr
Represented By: Jason Severin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude's Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church of the Redeemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of the Good Shepherd Charleston SC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Philips Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Johns Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bartholomews Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. David Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church of our Savior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church of the Holy Comforter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christ Episcopal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Saint Michael in Charleston in the State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestries and Churchwardens of the Parish of St. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Of The Resurrection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of the Redeemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestry and Church Wardens of St. Jude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Of The Cross Inc and Church Of The Cross Declaration of Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protestant Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Judes Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Saints Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protestant Episcopal Church of The Parish of Saint Phillip in Charleston in the State of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of the Good Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Of The Holy Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Episcopal Church of the Resurrection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Episcopal Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Insurance Company of Vermont, The
Represented By: Edward K Pritchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?