Samuel v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Robert T Samuel, III
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01787
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to amend pleadings 9/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/21/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/21/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/21/2019, Discovery due by 12/20/2019, Motions due by 2/20/2020, Mediation Due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 08/22/2019. (egra, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 to edit docket text (egra, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Bowens, Barbara)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert T Samuel, III. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope) (egra, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint, First attachment description: Supporting Documents. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (egra, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order Service - Non-Inmate, #10 Summons Issued as to USA placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417 (egra, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 10/10/2019. (egra, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 07/12/2019. (egra, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (egra, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert T Samuel, III.(hada, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX200016462.), filed by Robert T Samuel, III. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, ) Modified on 7/3/2019 Additional Attachments #6 and #12 filed (egra, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T Samuel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?