Gathers v. United States of America, The

Plaintiff: Dwayne L Gathers
Defendant: United States of America, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv01788
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint Expert Affidavit of Merit by Dwayne L Gathers. (Waggoner, Geoffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 Gibson CV) (vdru, ). Modified to add attached as provided by the filer on 8/7/2019 (vdru, ).
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of United States of America, The (Drake, Beth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed (US AG) by Dwayne L Gathers. (Waggoner, Geoffrey). Refiled by the Clerk to correct the filing event. (vdru, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwayne L Gathers. United States of America, The (US Attorney for SC) served on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Waggoner, Geoffrey). Refiled by the Clerk to correct filing event. (vdru, )
June 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, The. (U.S. Attorney). (vdru, ) Modified to edit text on 6/25/2019 (vdru, ).
June 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dwayne L Gathers.(vdru, )
June 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8519473.), filed by Dwayne L Gathers. Service due by 9/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim to VA).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gathers v. United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne L Gathers
Represented By: Geoffrey H Waggoner
Represented By: Charles MacDonald Gibson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?