Charleston International Airport v. Tame Airlines Inc
Plaintiff: Charleston International Airport
Defendant: Tame Airlines Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01911
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/9/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/23/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/23/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/17/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/23/2020, Discovery due by 2/17/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 6/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/19/2019. (sshe, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Dkt. No. #6 ). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/6/2019.(sshe, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Charleston International Airport.(Johnson, Wilbur)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim #4 of Tame Airlines, Inc. by Charleston International Airport.(Johnson, Wilbur)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Charleston County Response filed by Tame Airlines Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Sumner, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Becdach)(Sumner, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilbur Eugene Johnson on behalf of Charleston International Airport (Johnson, Wilbur)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Charleston County by Charleston International Airport. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Goodstein, Arnold)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of Receipt of Removal)(Sumner, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Tame Airlines, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Non-Jury Trial Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Charleston International Airport by Tame Airlines Inc.(Sumner, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tame Airlines Inc.(sshe, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-1567. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8540484), filed by Tame Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charleston International Airport v. Tame Airlines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston International Airport
Represented By: Arnold Samuel Goodstein
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tame Airlines Inc
Represented By: Robert E Sumner, IV
Represented By: Kenyatta L Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?