Dye v. Thompson Construction Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kelley Leigh Dye
Defendant: Thompson Construction Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01931
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/21/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/4/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/25/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/25/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/25/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/25/2019, Discovery due by 1/24/2020, Motions due by 3/24/2020, Mediation Due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/31/2019. (hada, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thompson Construction Group, Inc..(Glass, Benjamin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Thompson Construction Group, Inc..(Glass, Benjamin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelley Leigh Dye. Thompson Construction Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Merck, Weston)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kelley Leigh Dye. (egra, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thompson Construction Group, Inc. Service due by 10/7/2019. (egra, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thompson Construction Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8544001.), filed by Kelley Leigh Dye. Service due by 10/7/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dye v. Thompson Construction Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Leigh Dye
Represented By: Weston Trey Merck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?