Heyward v. Stillwater Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Myreanna Heyward
Defendant: Stillwater Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01955
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/4/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/14/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/13/2020, Discovery due by 3/27/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 4/10/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 8/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/22/2019. (vdru, ) Modified to edit docket text on 8/23/2019 (sshe, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 4/27/2020. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/22/2019. (vdru, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Stillwater Insurance Company. Attachment from entry #9 removed and filed separately.(jbry, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Stillwater Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Main Document, # 3 LR 26.03 Answers)(Davis, Benjamin) Modified on 8/22/2019 to delete attachment and file separately as entry #10 (jbry, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Myreanna Heyward.(Kefalos, George)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Davis, Benjamin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/14/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/16/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/23/2019, Discovery due by 1/13/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 1/27/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 5/1/2020 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/17/2019. (sshe, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Stillwater Insurance Company.(Davis, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stillwater Insurance Company (Davis, Benjamin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stillwater Insurance Company.(sshe, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-02998. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8552077), filed by Stillwater Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyward v. Stillwater Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myreanna Heyward
Represented By: Brett Lamb Stevens
Represented By: George J Kefalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stillwater Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Baldwin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?