Calhoun v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Theresa D Calhoun
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 2:2019cv01980
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cpeg, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order Service - Non-Inmate placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Theresa D Calhoun PO Box 611 Abbeville, SC 29620 (cpeg, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 08/15/2019. (cpeg, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order with required documents, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Theresa D Calhoun PO Box 611 Abbeville, SC 29620. (cpeg, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REFERENCE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/23/2019.(cpeg, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/23/2019. (cpeg, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Theresa D Calhoun. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (cpeg, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Theresa D Calhoun. (cpeg, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Theresa D Calhoun. Service due by 10/15/2019 (cpeg, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #1 Envelope) (cpeg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa D Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?