State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, 3M Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02123
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Counsel should prepare and submit a proposed order in Word document format for any Motion to Withdraw as Attorney via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Northern, 1:19-cv-00707, State of New York v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2123-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 4 govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 JPMDL Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order. Opposition which was filed by Plaintiff has been withdrawn. The stay on Conditional Transfer Order CTO#13 filed on 6/18/2019 has been lifted as to this action. The case is transferred to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 COURT NOTICE re 8 Order setting the Initial Conference to 9/17/2019. Parties are advised that with the Stay in place on this case [Order, Dkt. No. 17], the Initial conference scheduled for 9/17/2019 @ 9:30am is adjourned without date. (tab) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP filed a letter motion seeking a stay of all proceedings and deadlines following a decision on the issue of transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML). Dkt. No. 12. At a telephone conference on July 23, 2019, all parties present consented to the stay. Accordingly, the letter request, dkt. no. 12, is GRANTED, and all deadlines in this matter, including discovery, are STAYED pending a decision by the JPML. SO ORDERED. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/23/19. [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Telephonic Conference: A Telephone Conference has been set for Tuesday, 7/23/2019 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call.(tab) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Petrosinelli on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Petrosinelli, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Douglas E. Fleming for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP requesting the opportunity to file a full brief under the ordinary procedures if briefing on the issue is to occur submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER BRIEF in Opposition to Letter Request for a Stay, and in Support of Remand by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Bein, Philip) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Douglas E. Fleming III for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP requesting stay of proceedings submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Philip Bein for State of New York requesting conference concerning motion to remand action back to State Court submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Bein, Philip) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Nunno Corbo on behalf of Buckeye Fire Equipment Company (Corbo, Ellen) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Ellen Nunno Corbo, Esq. regarding Dkt. No. #4 Notice of Admission Requirement stating that she will remain as counsel of record for Defendant, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company and that she is applying for permanent admission. (hmr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Letter Request to adopt and approve the stipulation to extend answer deadline. 3M Company answer due 8/15/2019; Buckeye Fire Equipment Company answer due 8/15/2019; Chemguard, Inc. answer due 8/15/2019; National Foam, Inc. answer due 8/15/2019; Tyco Fire Products LP answer due 8/15/2019. The Initial Conference has also been reset. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/10/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference is reset for 9/17/2019 @ 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/19/2019. (tab) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Andrew J. Calica for 3M Company requesting Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Stipulation)(Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Calica on behalf of 3M Company (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 17, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for 3M Company answer due 6/21/2019; Buckeye Fire Equipment Company answer due 6/21/2019; Chemguard, Inc. answer due 6/21/2019; National Foam, Inc. answer due 6/21/2019; Tyco Fire Products LP answer due 6/21/2019. (dpk)[Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company; Attorney Ellen Nunno Corbo, Esq. admission due by 6/28/2019. [Copy of this notice emailed to Ellen Nunno Corbo, Esq. on 6/14/2019] (dpk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Records filed by 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP. (dpk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Albany, case number 900810-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4770960) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc. and Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint from State Court), #2 Exhibit B (Consent to Removal by 3M Company), #3 Exhibit C (Consent to Removal by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company), #4 Exhibit D (Consent to Removal by National Foam, Inc.), #5 Exhibit E (Performance Specification), #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 8/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen N Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Philip M. Bein
Represented By: Brendan S McGrath
Represented By: Matthew J. Sinkman
Represented By: Lisa M. Burianek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?