Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma v. 3MCompany et al
Plaintiff: Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Doe Defendants 1 to 20 and 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02192
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by R Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DeGeorge, R)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma. Buckeye Fire Equipment Company served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Buckeye Fire Equipment Counsel Accepting Service)(Williams, D.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma. National Foam Inc served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from National Foam Counsel Accepting Service)(Williams, D.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma. Kidde-Fenwal Inc served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Kidde-Fenwal Counsel Accepting Service)(Williams, D.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma. by 3M Company 3M Company served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from 3M Accepting Service)(Williams, D.)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma re Additional Attachments to Main Document, #15 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service on The Chemours Company)(Williams, D.) (Main Document 23 replaced on 10/2/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/2/2019 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma re Additional Attachments to Main Document, #15 Summons Issued , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service on E.I. Dupon De NeMours and Company)(Williams, D.) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/2/2019) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/2/2019 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user (sshe, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Richardson, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dinkins, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice W Parham Casey on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Casey, Alice)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Moylan, III on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Moylan, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma.. (Williams, D.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, National Foam Inc. (sshe, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Cox on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cox, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John DS Gilmour on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02192-RMG, 2:19-cv-02196-RMG(Gilmour, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Jackson on behalf of MRP Properties Company, LLC, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02192-RMG, 2:19-cv-02196-RMG(Jackson, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Oklahoma Eastern, 6:19-cv-00223, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2192-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00223. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) (MDL NO. 2873) transferring case to District of South Carolina (case terminated) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 JURY DEMAND by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk Regarding Removal by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip) Modified on 7/16/2019 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phillip G. Whaley on behalf of 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 12, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/12/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1280360 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/18/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 11, 2019 PETITION filed in State Court against 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, Doe Defendants 1 to 20, E.I. de Pont de Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc. by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number 19-CJ-148 by 3M Company (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by 3M Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma v. 3MCompany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Represented By: R Steven DeGeorge
Represented By: Stephen M Cox
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Phillip G. Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma
Represented By: D. Kenyon Williams, Jr.
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?