Whitfield v. United States Probation Office et al
Plaintiff: Divine Naquann Whitfield and Shawn Sinclair
Defendant: Sean Kitrell, Marc P Embler, J Scott Youngblood, Kelli M Frye, Robert Haley, United States District Court, United States Probation Office, Alicia Vachira Penn, United States Attorneys Office, Federal Public Defenders Office, Elizabeth G Windham, Sherii A Lydon, Maurice L Bianchi, Cody James Groeber, Rene Josey and Ann Briks Walsh
Case Number: 2:2019cv02212
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 32 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Divine Naquann Whitfield. Document Returned: 17 Order, (kric, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 31 ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED 17 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair 220 Hodge Road Summerville, SC 29483 (kric, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay by Divine Naquann Whitfield. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Divine Naquann Whitfield. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 26 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair 220 Hodge Road Summerville, SC 29483 (kric, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 18, 19 Reason: see order 26, chambers direction Modified filing date to that of original filing: 9/19/2019 (kric, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER instructing the clerk to delete 18 Order and 19 Report and Recommendation. These two entries were inadvertently docketed in the wrong case; thus, they are to be removed from this docket. As noted by the court on September 9, 2019, this case is stayed pending the resolution of the plaintiffs appeal of the courts denial of his motion for recusal (doc. 17). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/19/2019. (kric, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 ***DOCUMENT RE-MAILED 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Divine Naquann Whitfield, 18 Order, 17 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to updated address Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair 220 Hodge Road Summerville, SC 29483 (kric, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Divine Naquann Whitfield. Address updated. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair #48409 Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue Charleston, SC 29405 (kric, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Divine Naquann Whitfield, 18 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair #48409 Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue Charleston, SC 29405 (kric, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER staying case pending disposition of the appeal by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. The plaintiff has filed an interlocutory appeal of the court's denial of his motion for recusal (docs. 11, 13). As such, until the appeal has been resolved, the court is without jurisdiction to rule on currently pending or future motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/9/19. (ctuc, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #13 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (bgoo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #14 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, #13 Notice of Appeal, and docket sheet printed from public terminal placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair, #48409, Charleston County Detention Center, 3841 Leeds Avenue, Charleston, SC 29405 (bgoo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #13 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (bgoo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Order on Motion for Recusal by Divine Naquann Whitfield. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Letter from the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals regarding misrouted appeal, #3 Envelope) (bgoo)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order on Motion for Recusal placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to a/k/a Shawn Sinclair #48409 Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue Charleston, SC 29405 (cper, )
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8 Motion to disqualify. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/16/19.(cper, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Recusal by Divine Naquann Whitfield. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Divine Naquann Whitfield a/k/a Shawn Sinclair #48409 Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue Charleston, SC 29405 with blank paper (kric, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/30/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/9/19. (ctuc, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (kric, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX200016567.) No envelope, case was hand delivered., filed by Divine Naquann Whitfield. Service due by 11/5/2019(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. United States Probation Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Divine Naquann Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Kitrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc P Embler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Scott Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli M Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Vachira Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Public Defenders Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth G Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherii A Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice L Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody James Groeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Josey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Briks Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?