Ward v. McLeod Health et al
Plaintiff: Tammie Lynn Ward
Defendant: McCleod Health Clarendon and McLeod Health
Case Number: 2:2019cv02220
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/14/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/24/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2020, Discovery due by 3/3/2020, Motions due by 5/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 09/10/2019. (egra, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by McCleod Health Clarendon, McLeod Health.(Asper, Lucas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by McCleod Health Clarendon, McLeod Health.(Asper, Lucas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammie Lynn Ward. McCleod Health Clarendon served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; McLeod Health served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ricker, Brice)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tammie Lynn Ward. (egra, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to McCleod Health Clarendon, McLeod Health. Service due by 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons - McCleod Health Clarendon) (egra, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCleod Health Clarendon, McLeod Health ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8603015.), filed by Tammie Lynn Ward. Service due by 11/6/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. McLeod Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Lynn Ward
Represented By: Brice E Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCleod Health Clarendon
Represented By: Lucas James Asper
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLeod Health
Represented By: Lucas James Asper
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?