NH, State of v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: NH, State of
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, National Foam Inc, 3M Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, The Chemours Company LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02285
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha N Donovan on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Donovan, Martha)
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Raymond-Flood on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Raymond-Flood, Margaret)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by R Steven DeGeorge on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DeGeorge, R)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Richardson, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dinkins, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice W Parham Casey on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Casey, Alice)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Moylan, III on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Moylan, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Cox on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cox, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana M Rowenko on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Rowenko, Lana)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John DS Gilmour on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Gilmour, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Jackson on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Jackson, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Hampshire, 1:19-cv-00800, NH, State of v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2285-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of New Hampshire; Case Number 1:19-cv-00800. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ko) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MDL FINAL ORDER: Case is transferred to United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. MDL No. 2873. (ko) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER MDL No. 2 re: conditional transfer to United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. Stay is lifted as no objection to the transfer was filed with the Panel. 2873. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/11/2019. (ko) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sackman, Edward) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J. Sackman on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. Attorney Edward J. Sackman added to party Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sackman, Edward) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NH, State of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. 3M Service Documents, #2 Exhibit B. DuPont Service Documents, #3 Exhibit C. Chemours Service to Reg Agent, #4 Exhibit D. Buckeye Service Documents, #5 Exhibit E. Buckeye Service Documents, #6 Exhibit F. Chemguard Service Documents, #7 Exhibit G. Chemguard Service Documents, #8 Exhibit H. Chemours Service Documents, #9 Exhibit I. Chemours Service Documents, #10 Exhibit J. Kidde Fenwal Service Documents, #11 Exhibit K. Kidde Fenwal Service Documents, #12 Exhibit L. National Foam Service Documents, #13 Exhibit M. National Foam Service Documents, #14 Exhibit N. Tyco Service Documents, #15 Exhibit O. Tyco Service Documents)(Head, Richard) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Until the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this case to the pending AFFF Multidistrict Litigation in the USDC for the District of South Carolina. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to Until the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this case to the pending AFFF Multidistrict Litigation in the USDC for the District of South Carolina filed by 3M Company.(Rouvalis, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-00446, Hillsborough County North County Superior Court(Rouvalis, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. Foster on behalf of 3M Company Attorney Joseph A. Foster added to party 3M Company(pty:dft).(Foster, Joseph) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by 3M Company disclosing no parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Rouvalis, Mark) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER MDL No. 1 (CTO-17) re: Conditional transfer to United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. Order is not effective until filed in the transferee court. 2873. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/3/2019. (ko) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard W Head on behalf of NH, State of Attorney Richard W Head added to party NH, State of(pty:pla).(Head, Richard) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MDL - Notice of Filing, copy of the docket sheet, and a copy of the Notice of Removal sent to the MDL Panel for review. MDL Follow Up Deadline set for 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal) (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher G Aslin(NHAG) on behalf of NH, State of Attorney Christopher G Aslin(NHAG) added to party NH, State of(pty:pla).(Aslin(NHAG), Christopher) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by 3M Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. 3M Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, LLC., Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., and National Foam, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by August 8, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Ellen Nunno Corbo Esq., Keith E. Smith, Esq., Jonathan I. Handler, Esq., Joseph G. Petrosinelli, Esq., and Liam J. Montgomery, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 9/3/2019. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
August 1, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-800-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court, case number 216-2019-CV-00446 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1842973) filed by 3M Company. Answer Follow Up on 8/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - September 2017 MilSpec, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Notice of Removal to Counsel, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. 5 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Rouvalis, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #6 CORRECTED Notice of Removal with Signature) (ej). [Transferred from New Hampshire on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NH, State of v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Joseph A. Foster
Represented By: Mark C Rouvalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Isaac Handler
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company LLC
Represented By: David Himelfarb
Represented By: Stephen M Cox
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: R Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NH, State of
Represented By: Kelvin A Brooks
Represented By: Christopher G Aslin
Represented By: Richard W Head
Represented By: Lana M Rowenko
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?