Wiggins v. SSA Atlantic, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonette Wiggins
Defendant: SSA Atlantic, LLC, International Longshoreman's Association Local 1771 and International Longshoreman's Association Local 1422
Case Number: 2:2019cv02291
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/3/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/3/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2020, Discovery due by 4/3/2020, Motions due by 6/3/2020, Mediation Due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/09/2019. (egra, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by International Longshoreman's Association Local 1771. Response to Motion due by 10/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Holmes, Allan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSA Atlantic, LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SSA Atlantic, LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilbur Eugene Johnson on behalf of SSA Atlantic, LLC (Johnson, Wilbur)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonette Wiggins. International Longshoreman's Association Local 1771 served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; SSA Atlantic, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Tong, Emily)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Antonette Wiggins. (egra, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to International Longshoreman's Association Local 1422, International Longshoreman's Association Local 1771, SSA Atlantic, LLC. Service due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Internation Longshoreman's Association Local 1422, #2 Summons - Internation Longshoreman's Association Local 1771) (egra, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Longshoreman's Association Local 1422, International Longshoreman's Association Local 1771, SSA Atlantic, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8614544.), filed by Antonette Wiggins. Service due by 11/12/2019. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. SSA Atlantic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonette Wiggins
Represented By: Emily Hanewicz Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoreman's Association Local 1771
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoreman's Association Local 1422
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?