Boston v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jason Boston
Defendant: Correctional Officer Mccall, Correctional Officer Parker, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Warden Eagleton, Correctional Officer Raleigh, Correctional Officer Sterling, Warden Stonebreaker, Correctional Officer West and Correctional Officer Lucas
Case Number: 2:2019cv02315
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Jason Boston. (Bell, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jason Boston.(Bell, James)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 10/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/3/2020, Discovery due by 3/3/2020, Motions due by 5/4/2020, Mediation Due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/09/2019. (hada, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by South Carolina Department of Corrections, Warden Eagleton, Warden Stonebreaker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thomas, Lisa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Correctional Officer Lucas, Correctional Officer Mccall, Correctional Officer Parker, Correctional Officer Raleigh, Correctional Officer Sterling, Correctional Officer West, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Warden Eagleton, Warden Stonebreaker.(hada, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8617944), filed by Correctional Officer Lucas, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Warden Stonebreaker, Correctional Officer West, Correctional Officer Parker, Correctional Officer Mccall, Correctional Officer Raleigh, Correctional Officer Sterling, Warden Eagleton. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Mccall
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Parker
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Eagleton
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Raleigh
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Sterling
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Stonebreaker
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer West
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Lucas
Represented By: Lisa Arlene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Boston
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?