Horsham Water and Sewer Authority v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Horsham Water and Sewer Authority
Defendant: Dynax Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, Dupont De Nemours Inc, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, 3M Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02474
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Dowdupont Inc., Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Hacker, Katherine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE RE Counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form, when necessary, to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach a page which includes the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6 re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant). Do not e-file. Forward in PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Richardson, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dinkins, Mary)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice W Parham Casey on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Casey, Alice)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Moylan, III on behalf of EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Moylan, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Warminster Township Municipal Authority v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2474-RMG Plaintiff state of residence: Pennsylvania Eastern. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 10/04/2019 9:00 AM, with Science Day immediately following (see Dkt. No. 157 in 2:18-mn-2873-RMG), in Charleston Courtroom ***#3 (with overflow in Charleston Courtroom #1)***, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8646152.), filed by Horsham Water and Sewer Authority. Service due by 12/2/2019 (new direct filed case opened as of date filed in MDL shell)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horsham Water and Sewer Authority v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: David R Erickson
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Represented By: John C Moylan, III
Represented By: Alice W Parham Casey
Represented By: Katherine LI Hacker
Represented By: Mary Lucille Dinkins
Represented By: Matthew T Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Represented By: David R Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horsham Water and Sewer Authority
Represented By: Lawrence R Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?