Moore v. Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC
Plaintiff: Foster Moore
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02496
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
2 Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Belton Declaration) (Edmondson, Bethany) (egra, ) Refiled to correct event type
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion. Replies due by 10/25/2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/21/2019. (egra, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11 Reason: Refiled as entry #12 . (egra, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Edmondson, Bethany) Modified on 10/18/2019 to correct filing date (egra, ).
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Foster Moore.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/18/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Gist, Donald)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Ashley Kutz Kelley for 10/10/2019 through 2/28/2020 (Kelley, Ashley)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:19-cv-2496-DCN-MGB to 2:19-cv-02496-DCN-BM. Please use this case number on all future filings. (egra, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/6/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/6/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/27/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/27/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/27/2020, Discovery due by 3/27/2020, Motions due by 5/27/2020, Mediation Due by 4/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/02/2019. (egra, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Team Member Handbook, #3 Exhibit At Will Disclaimer executed on 5/22/19, #4 Exhibit At Will Disclaimer executed on 5/7/18, #5 Exhibit Acknowledgment and Disclaimer executed on 8/7/17)No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Kelley, Ashley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC. (abuc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Foster Moore.(abuc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8651757.), filed by Foster Moore. Service due by 12/3/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Vans LLC
Represented By: Ashley Kutz Kelley
Represented By: Bethany Lynne Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Moore
Represented By: Aaron Vernon Wallace
Represented By: Donald Gist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?