Hollinshead v. Medical University of South Carolina, The
Plaintiff: Tocarra Hollinshead
Defendant: Medical University of South Carolina, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv02517
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The file reflects that the Summons and Complaint were served on the Defendant on September 24, 2019. However, no responsive pleading has been filed, nor has there been any further activity in the file. Therefore, It is ordered that Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of this matter, in writing, by no later than November 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/30/2019. (egra, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Tocarra Hollinshead. Answer due by 10/15/2019. All Defendants. (Rode, Thomas) Modified on 9/25/2019 to add answer due date (egra, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Medical University of South Carolina, The. (bshr, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tocarra Hollinshead.(bshr, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical University of South Carolina, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8654312.), filed by Tocarra Hollinshead. Service due by 12/5/2019(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollinshead v. Medical University of South Carolina, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical University of South Carolina, The
Represented By: Bob J Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tocarra Hollinshead
Represented By: Thomas J Rode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?