State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02607
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Northern, 1:19-cv-01050, State of New York v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2607-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 10/04/2019 9:00 AM, with Science Day immediately following (see Dkt. No. 157 in 2:18-mn-2873-RMG), in Charleston Courtroom ***#3 (with overflow in Charleston Courtroom #1)***, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01050. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #18. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Cerreta, John) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Horn, Michael) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jhandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is 617-345-4600. Admissions due by 9/6/2019. {Clerk served Attorney by email on 8/23/2019} (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Tyco Fire Products, LP and Chemguard, Inc.; Attorney Thomas J. Herten and Nicole G. McDonough, Email address is therten@archerlaw.com and nmcdonough@archerlaw.com. Phone number is 201-498-8502. Admissions due by 9/6/2019. {Clerk served Attorney's by email on 8/23/2019}(jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 10/1/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/24/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint) (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 904649-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4848089) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Ellen Nunno Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Michael S. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: John W Cerreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Michael S. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Brendan S McGrath
Represented By: Philip M Bein
Represented By: Matthew J. Sinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?