Rogers v. Hamilton et al
Plaintiff: Latoya Rogers
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers, United States Postal Service, South Carolina State Association of Letter Carriers Inc., Michael Hamilton and AFL-CIO
Case Number: 2:2019cv02807
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Melissa S. Woods to Appear Pro Hac Vice for AFL-CIO, National Association of Letter Carriers. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/31/2019.(sshe, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa S. Woods ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8749121) by AFL-CIO, National Association of Letter Carriers. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Application and Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Holmes, Allan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Latoya Rogers.(Andrews, Ryan)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Based on the stipulation, the named Defendants shall have until December 2, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/11/2019. (egra, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Regarding Service and Time to Respond or otherwise Plead by AFL-CIO, Michael Hamilton, National Association of Letter Carriers, South Carolina State Association of Letter Carriers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Time to Respond or Plead)(Holmes, Allan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AFL-CIO, Michael Hamilton, National Association of Letter Carriers, South Carolina State Association of Letter Carriers Inc. (egra, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-10-4584. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8701950), filed by Michael Hamilton, South Carolina State Association of Letter Carriers Inc., National Association of Letter Carriers, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of filing Notice of Removal) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Hamilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Represented By: Melissa S Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina State Association of Letter Carriers Inc.
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFL-CIO
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Represented By: Cheryl H Ledbetter
Represented By: Melissa S Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Rogers
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?