International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers v. Ring et al
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Defendant: Lauren McFerran, Marvin Kaplan, John Ring, National Labor Relations Board, The and William Emanuel
Intervenor: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03214
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Helene D. Lerner and David P. Boehm who represent the National Labor Relations Board are granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/10/2019.(vdru, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Helene D. Lerner by National Labor Relations Board, The. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Modica, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (vdru, ). Modified to add Certificate of Good Standing provided by the filer on 12/9/2019 (vdru, ).
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David P. Boehm by National Labor Relations Board, The. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Modica, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is ordered that Joshua A. Segal, Richard F. Griffin, Jr. and Matthew H. Clash-Drexler are granted Pro Hac Vice Admission in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/3/2019.(vdru, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew H. Clash-Drexler ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8804618) by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. Response to Motion due by 12/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Derfner, Armand)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard F. Griffin, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8804602) by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. Response to Motion due by 12/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Derfner, Armand)
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua A. Segal ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8804558) by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. Response to Motion due by 12/17/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Derfner, Armand)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Derfner, Armand) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/4/2019) (vdru, ). Modified to replace with corrected document as provided by filer on 12/4/2019 (vdru, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Modica on behalf of National Labor Relations Board, The (Modica, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by The Boeing Company. Response to Motion due by 12/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NLRB Decision - The Boeing Company, 368 NLRB No. 67, #2 Envelope NLRB Decision - PCC Structurals, Inc., 365 NLRB No. 160)No proposed order.(Cherry, Molly)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to John Ring, Chairman. (vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to National Labor Relations Board. (vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lauren McFerran, Board Member. (vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendants (U.S. Attorney Sherri Lydon).(vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marvin Kaplan, Board Member. (vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Emanuel, Board Member. (vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Emanuel, Marvin Kaplan, Lauren McFerran, National Labor Relations Board, John Ring. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attorney General). (vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers.(vdru, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8775320.), filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. Service due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Regional Director's Decision, #2 Exhibit B: Decision of NLRB).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers v. Ring et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Represented By: Armand Georges Derfner
Represented By: Matthew Hirsh Clash-Drexler
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Segal
Represented By: Richard F Griffin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren McFerran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Labor Relations Board, The
Represented By: Helene Debra Lerner
Represented By: David P Boehm
Represented By: Matthew J Modica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Molly Hughes Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?