Bryant v. C.K.S. Packaging, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruby L. Bryant
Defendant: C.K.S. Packaging, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03450
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
2 Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/25/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 3/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/31/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/30/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/1/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/1/2020, Discovery due by 7/31/2020, Motions due by 9/29/2020, Mediation Due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 02/04/2020. (hada, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by C.K.S. Packaging, Inc..(Byzet, Piper)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruby L. Bryant. C.K.S. Packaging, Inc. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tong, Emily)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ruby L. Bryant. (egra, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C.K.S. Packaging, Inc.. Service due by 3/10/2020. (egra, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/13/2019) (egra, ).
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.K.S. Packaging, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number number 0420-8823118.), filed by Ruby L. Bryant. Service due by 3/10/2020. (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. C.K.S. Packaging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.K.S. Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Piper Reiff Byzet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby L. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Hanewicz Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?