Dawson v. Belmond Charleston Place
Plaintiff: Marie L. Dawson
Defendant: Belmond Charleston Place
Case Number: 2:2019cv03484
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/30/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/13/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/13/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/9/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/12/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/9/2020, Discovery due by 7/24/2020, Motions due by 8/10/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/9/2020, ADR Statement due by 8/10/2020, Mediation Due by 9/9/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least one week prior to date of trial.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/10/2020. (dsto, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Belmond Charleston Place.(Holmes, Allan) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/9/2020 with corrected document provided by filing user) (dsto)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Belmond Charleston Place.(Holmes, Allan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/9/2020 with corrected document provided by filing user) (dsto)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie L. Dawson. Belmond Charleston Place served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McKenzie, Jacob)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Belmond Charleston Place. Service due by 3/16/2020. (dsto, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Marie L. Dawson.(dsto, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belmond Charleston Place (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8829871), filed by Marie L. Dawson. Service due by 3/16/2020.(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Belmond Charleston Place
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie L. Dawson
Represented By: Jacob C McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmond Charleston Place
Represented By: Rebecca Jane Wolfe
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?