Barker v. Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc
Plaintiff: Jared R Barker
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03493
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
2 Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.(Eibling, Sarah)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/3/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/18/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/18/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/9/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/8/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/8/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/8/2020, Discovery due by 7/7/2020, Motions due by 9/8/2020, Mediation Due by 8/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/13/2020. (hada, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.(Eibling, Sarah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.(Eibling, Sarah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.(Eibling, Sarah)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared R Barker. Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Potts, A)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc. (hada, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jared R Barker.(hada, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8831245.), filed by Jared R Barker. Service due by 3/16/2020(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc
Represented By: Robert Watson Foster, Jr
Represented By: Debbie Whittle Durban
Represented By: Sarah Theresa Eibling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared R Barker
Represented By: A Christopher Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?