The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corp., National Foam Inc, 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment CO, Tyco Fire Products LP, Ansul Company, Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., United Technologies Corporation and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00037
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service (returns) to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only. Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gale D Pearson on behalf of The Town of Grantsville, Maryland, The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-00036-RMG, 2:20-cv-00037-RMG(Pearson, Gale)
January 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R McCarley on behalf of The Town of Grantsville, Maryland, The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-00036-RMG, 2:20-cv-00037-RMG(McCarley, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Maryland, 1:19-cv-03415, The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-00037-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-03415. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the USDC for the District of South Carolina. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 12/27/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/31/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiff The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Plaintiff The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/18/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 12/3/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland or counsel for The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/17/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8374223.), filed by Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from Maryland on 1/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansul Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Town of Mountain Lake Park, Maryland
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Novak
Represented By: Gale D Pearson
Represented By: Matthew R McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?