Ross Marine LLC v. S/V Airways et al
Plaintiff: Ross Marine LLC
Defendant: Thomas A Morelli, III and S/V Airways
Case Number: 2:2020cv00721
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A Morelli, III, S/V Airways re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Corvey, Edward)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas A Morelli, III, S/V Airways.(Corvey, Edward)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ross Marine LLC by Thomas A Morelli, III.(Corvey, Edward)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ross Marine LLC by S/V Airways.(Corvey, Edward)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Ross Marine LLC. Thomas A Morelli, III served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Scott, William) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/26/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/26/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ross Marine LLC. Thomas A Morelli, III served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Scott, William)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ross Marine LLC. S/V Airways served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Scott, William) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/21/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/21/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ross Marine LLC.(jbry, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8945194.), filed by Ross Marine LLC. Service due by 5/13/2020(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross Marine LLC v. S/V Airways et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Marine LLC
Represented By: William A Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Morelli, III
Represented By: Edward R Corvey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S/V Airways
Represented By: Edward R Corvey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?