Mooberry v. Charleston Southern University
Plaintiff: Christine Mooberry
Defendant: Charleston Southern University
Case Number: 2:2020cv00769
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jill Zwagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christine Mooberry. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/2/2020.(sshe, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill Zwagerman ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8975501) by Christine Mooberry. Response to Motion due by 3/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Proposed Order Propose Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Falls, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilbur Eugene Johnson on behalf of Charleston Southern University (Johnson, Wilbur)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christine Mooberry.(hada, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Charleston Southern University. Service due by 5/19/2020 (hada, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston Southern University ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8955711.), filed by Christine Mooberry. Service due by 5/19/2020(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooberry v. Charleston Southern University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Southern University
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Mooberry
Represented By: Joseph Scott Falls
Represented By: Jill Zwagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?