Kalispel Tribe of Indians et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Kalispel Tribal Economic Authority, Northern Quest Resort and Casino and Kalispel Tribe of Indians
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Kidde Fire Fighting Inc, National Foam Inc, 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01398
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Washington Eastern, 2:20-cv-00127, Kalispel Tribe of Indians et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-1398-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 10 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 5.B, 10.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference To Be Determined due to COVID-19 before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00127. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to District of South Carolina re: MDL No. 2873. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of MDL Panel. (CV, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 4/14/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Louis Welcker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Attorney Zachary Louis Welcker added to party Kalispel Tribal Economic Authority(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary Louis Welcker added to party Kalispel Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary Louis Welcker added to party Northern Quest Resort and Casino(pty:pla))(Welcker, Zachary) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 4/14/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Kalispel Tribal Economic Authority, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Northern Quest Resort and Casino. (Lee, Valerie) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Buckeye, #2 Summons - Chemguard, #3 Summons - Kidde, #4 Summons - National Foam, #5 Summons - Tyco, #6 Summons - USA DC, #7 Summons - USA Spokane, #8 Summons - USA - USAF)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3431650) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Lee, Valerie) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 4/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalispel Tribe of Indians et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalispel Tribal Economic Authority
Represented By: Valerie Ann Lee
Represented By: Zachary Louis Welcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Quest Resort and Casino
Represented By: Valerie Ann Lee
Represented By: Zachary Louis Welcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalispel Tribe of Indians
Represented By: Valerie Ann Lee
Represented By: Zachary Louis Welcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?