Town Of East Hampton v. Incorporated Village Of East Hampton,
Plaintiff: Town of East Hampton
Defendant: Incorporated Village of East Hampton and Incorporated Village of East Hampton doing business as East Hampton Fire Department
Interested Party: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01665
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases. Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER This Order Relates to Cases: ((566) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (81) in case 2:19-cv-01639-RMG; (15) in case 2:20-cv-01665-RMG) East Hampton's motion for leave (Dkt. No. 566) is DENIED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/28/2020.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:20-cv-01665-RMG(sshe, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re (15 in 2:20-cv-01665-RMG, 81 in 2:19-cv-01639-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction Response filed by Town of East Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Affirmation, #2 Exhibit K- NYSDEC Demand)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:20-cv-01665-RMG(Rigano, Nicholas)
May 12, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re (15 in 2:20-cv-01665-RMG, 566 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction Response filed by Incorporated Village of East Hampton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/19/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Attaching Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Town Brief in Support of Motion to Vacate CTO 4, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Nicholas Valkenburg, #4 Exhibit Fire Department DFS)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-01665-RMG(McKenna, Caroline)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER Plaintiff Town of East Hampton has moved for leave to file a motion for preliminary injunction. (566 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 81 in case 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 15 in case 2:20-cv-01665-RMG). On or before May 15, 2020, Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel are DIRECTED to file a brief response to the motion, stating whether and why they do or do not authorize a motion for preliminary injunction. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/8/2020. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:20-cv-01665-RMG(sshe, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 582 (82, 17) Reason: Per chambers Filing date of original filing: 5/7/2020 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:20-cv-01665-RMG(sshe, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town of East Hampton. American Alternative Insurance Corporation served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Rigano, Nicholas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Town of East Hampton. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Motion, #2 Affidavit Affirmation, #3 Exhibit A- NYSDEC Report, #4 Exhibit B- Complaint, #5 Exhibit C- EHFD Survey, #6 Exhibit D- NYSDEC/NYSDOH Correspondence, #7 Exhibit E- NYSDEC Consent Order, #8 Exhibit F- Defendant's Website, #9 Exhibit G- Correspondence Among Counsel, #10 Exhibit H- Defendant Fact Sheet, #11 Exhibit I- Insurance Coverage Letter, #12 Exhibit J- Insurance Policy Marketing Materials)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-01639-RMG, 2:20-cv-01665-RMG(Rigano, Nicholas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Eastern, 2:20-cv-01787, Town Of East Hampton v. Incorporated Village Of East Hampton, as DSC case 2:20-cv-1665-RMG (sshe, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01787. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 28, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO -29) IN RE: AQUEOUS FILM-FORMING FOAMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2873. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 29) IN RE: AQUEOUS FILMFORMING FOAMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2873. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on United States Attorney General, Administrator for the United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Attorney on 4/17/20, filed by Town Of East Hampton. (Rigano, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town Of East Hampton. Incorporated Village Of East Hampton, served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Rigano, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Kovner on behalf of American Alternative Insurance Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Kovner, Paul) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Pinter on behalf of Incorporated Village Of East Hampton, (aty to be noticed) (Pinter, Edward) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline McKenna on behalf of Incorporated Village Of East Hampton, (aty to be noticed) (McKenna, Caroline) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Federal Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this SCHEDULING ORDER upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/17/2020. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Alternative Insurance Corporation. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Incorporated Village Of East Hampton,. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Incorporated Village Of East Hampton, filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12667669 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Town Of East Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Defendant, #4 Proposed Summons for Interested Party) (Rigano, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town Of East Hampton v. Incorporated Village Of East Hampton,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incorporated Village of East Hampton
Represented By: Caroline McKenna
Represented By: Edward M Pinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incorporated Village of East Hampton doing business as East Hampton Fire Department
Represented By: Caroline McKenna
Represented By: Edward M Pinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of East Hampton
Represented By: Nicholas Rigano
Represented By: James P. Rigano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Paul F. Kovner
Represented By: Paul F Kovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?