Throckmorton v. Summerville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Adam B Throckmorton
Defendant: Summerville, Town of, Jon Rogers and Summerville Police Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv01936
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jon Rogers, Summerville Police Department, Summerville, Town of.(Rollins, C)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO CONDUCT MEDIATION Mediation Due by 1/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/10/2020. (sshe, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Adam B Throckmorton.(Bojarski, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Adam B Throckmorton.(Bojarski, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Adam B Throckmorton.(Bojarski, Christopher)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND OPINION: Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleading (Dkt. No. 5) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's First Cause of Action for wrongful termination in violation of public policy and Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action for violation of the South Carolina Whistleblower Protection Act. Defendants' motion is otherwise DENIED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/26/20.(ltap, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response filed by Adam B Throckmorton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/11/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bojarski, Christopher)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/22/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/6/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 7/6/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/1/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/1/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/9/2020, Discovery due by 12/1/2020, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 12/15/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 3/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/1/2020. (sshe, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jon Rogers, Summerville Police Department, Summerville, Town of. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Incident Report, #2 Exhibit Findings & Recommendation)No proposed order.(Matthews, Eugene)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Jon Rogers, Summerville Police Department, Summerville, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Incident Report, #2 Exhibit Findings & Recommendation, #3 Exhibit Grievance Policy, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Kathy Windham)(Matthews, Eugene)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jon Rogers, Summerville Police Department, Summerville, Town of.(sshe, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-18-00735. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9110585), filed by Jon Rogers, Summerville Police Department, Summerville, Town of. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Throckmorton v. Summerville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerville, Town of
Represented By: C Cliff Rollins
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Rogers
Represented By: C Cliff Rollins
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerville Police Department
Represented By: C Cliff Rollins
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam B Throckmorton
Represented By: Christopher Bojarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?