Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al v. Drucker & Falk LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Defendant: Riverland LLC, BMW of North Charleston LLC, Drucker & Falk LLC, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, Donnie Hawkins, D&F Payroll Agent Inc and Quality Exteriors Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02513
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Julie F. Maloney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/27/2020.(sshe, )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Steven E. Leder to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/4/2020.(sshe, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Leder ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9248672) by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV - Steven Leder, #2 Exhibit B - MD Cert. Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - DC Cert. Good Standing, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Burchstead, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie F. Maloney ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9248652) by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Burchstead, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/26/2020) (sshe, ). Modified on 8/26/2020 to add certificate of good standing document as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued for #5 as to BMW of North Charleston LLC, D&F Payroll Agent Inc, Drucker & Falk LLC, Donnie Hawkins, Quality Exteriors Group LLC, Riverland LLC, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (sshe, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company. Service due by 10/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Management Agreement - AP, #3 Exhibit C Management Agreement - RW, #4 Exhibit D Policy ZHRA18309400 -Redacted, #5 Exhibit E Policy ZHRA18309401-Redacted, #6 Exhibit F Policy ZHRA18309402-Redacted, #7 Exhibit G Policy ZDRA18309403 -Redacted, #8 Exhibit H Policy ZDRA18309404 - Redacted, #9 Summons BMW of North Charleston, LLC, #10 Summons D&F Payroll Agent, Inc., #11 Summons Drucker & Falk, LLC, #12 Summons Donnie Hawkins, #13 Summons Quality Exteriors Group LLC, #14 Summons Riverland, LLC, #15 Summons State Farm & Casualty Co) (Burchstead, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company.(sshe, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9194636.), filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company. Service due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Management Agreement - AP, #3 Exhibit C - Management Agreement - RW, #4 Exhibit D - Policy ZHRA18309400 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit E - Policy ZHRA18309402 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit F - Policy ZDRA18309402 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit G - Policy ZDRA18309403-Redacted, #8 Exhibit H - Policy ZDRA18309404-Redacted)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al v. Drucker & Falk LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North Charleston LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drucker & Falk LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&F Payroll Agent Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Exteriors Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Christian Stegmaier
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Julie F Maloney
Represented By: Steven E Leder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Christian Stegmaier
Represented By: Michael Reid Burchstead
Represented By: Julie F Maloney
Represented By: Steven E Leder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?