Mackie v. Coconut Joe's IOP LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Mackie
Defendant: Joe Petro, CJ Offering LLC, Caitlin West and Coconut Joe's IOP LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02562
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/21/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/13/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/13/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/9/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/15/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/16/2021, Discovery due by 6/4/2021, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/18/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 8/1/2021, ADR Statement due by 7/1/2021, Mediation Due by 7/31/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/3/2020(jbry, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Coconut Joe's IOP LLC. (Tierney, Nicholas)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Crossclaim #13 by CJ Offering LLC, Joe Petro, Caitlin West.(Dukes, Lorene)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 Coconut Joes IOP, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM For Indemnification against CJ Offering LLC by Coconut Joe's IOP LLC.(Tierney, Nicholas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Caitlin West, CJ Offering LLC, Joe Petro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sign in Sheet, #2 Exhibit Texts with Caitlin West, #3 Exhibit Texts with Joe Petro)(Paylor, Alice)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Tierney on behalf of Coconut Joe's IOP LLC (Tierney, Nicholas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Rene S. Dukes for 10/13-22/2020. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/27/2020. (eric, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Lorene Stuhr Dukes for October 13 - October 22, 2020 (Dukes, Lorene)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Mackie. Served All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Mullaney, Marybeth)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorene Stuhr Dukes on behalf of CJ Offering LLC, Joe Petro, Caitlin West (Dukes, Lorene)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Fountain Paylor on behalf of CJ Offering LLC, Joe Petro, Caitlin West (Paylor, Alice)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CJ Offering LLC. (jbry, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coconut Joe's IOP LLC, Joe Petro, Caitlin West. (jbry, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Justin Mackie.(jbry, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207310.), filed by Justin Mackie. Service due by 10/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackie v. Coconut Joe's IOP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Petro
Represented By: Alice Fountain Paylor
Represented By: Lorene Stuhr Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Offering LLC
Represented By: Alice Fountain Paylor
Represented By: Lorene Stuhr Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin West
Represented By: Alice Fountain Paylor
Represented By: Lorene Stuhr Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coconut Joe's IOP LLC
Represented By: Lindsey W Cooper, Jr
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Mackie
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?