Costello v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Costello
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02566
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Costello.(Wheeler, Samuel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/30/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/4/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motions due by 5/3/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or 8/2/2021, Mediation Due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/24/2020. (vdru, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abee, Matthew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/2020. (vdru, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2020, Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Motions due by 3/3/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/2020. (vdru, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Brian Barnwell is relieved as counsel for SLS in this matter and SLS will continue to be represented by its other counsel of record who is also of Nelson Mullins. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/24/2020.(vdru, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exh. A - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barnwell, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Costello.(Wheeler, Samuel)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Dorchester County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal from Dorchester County Clerk)(Barnwell, Brian)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Barnwell, Brian)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(vdru, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-18-922. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207967), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Note, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Documents)(vdru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costello v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Costello
Represented By: Samuel Melvil Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Matthew Adams Abee
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?