Koh v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: COLLEEN KOH
Defendant: 3M Company, Dynax Corporation, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Corteva Inc, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co., Chemguard Inc and Tyco Fire Products LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv02796
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:20-cv-03310, Koh v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-2796-RMG (sshe, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03310. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-33). Re: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 USC sec. 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 demand for jury, #3 entry of appearance, #4 notice of removal, #5 Affidavit)(afm, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/13/20. 7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND CLERK C.C.P. MONTGOMERY COUNTY.(jpd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 7, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 3M COMPANY, BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CHEMGUARD, INC., CORTEVA, INC., DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC., DYNAX CORPORATION, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, KIDDE-FENWAL, INC., COLLEEN KOH, NATIONAL FOAM, INC., THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, FC, LLC, TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS, L.P.. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by 3M COMPANY.(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M COMPANY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14402684), filed by 3M COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Certificate of Service)(DISIPIO, BASIL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koh v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Basil A Disipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.
Represented By: Basil A Disipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLEEN KOH
Represented By: Nancy M Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?