Fultz v. Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Defendant: Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02877
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC.(Powell, Graham)Filed separately as correct event(sshe, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Removed and filed as separate event (LR 26.01 Answers Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments Rule 26.01 Disclosures))(Powell, Graham) Modified on 9/23/2020 to remove attachment and file separately as #17 (sshe, ).
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham P Powell on behalf of Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC (Powell, Graham)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC answer due 9/22/2020. (Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gantt-Sorenson on behalf of Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC (Gantt-Sorenson, Christine)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Fultz. Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020. (Richardson, Vanessa)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Fultz. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/14/2020.(sshe, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time Reply to Text Order by Mark Fultz. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Richardson, Vanessa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Mark Fultz. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A. MOTION FOR EXTYENSIONOF TIME)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Richardson, Vanessa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY by Mark Fultz to 6 Order, Reply to Text Order. (Richardson, Vanessa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Lawrence A. Fuller filed a motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff. (Dkt. No. 5). Defendant is instructed to file a consent or opposition to the motion by Monday, August 17, 2020. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/12/20. (ltap, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A. Fuller ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9268455) by Mark Fultz. Response to Motion due by 8/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Supporting Documents)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Richardson, Vanessa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #4 Supporting Documents DSC cases) (sshe, ). Modified on 8/14/2020 to add document provided by filing user(sshe, ).
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC. (sshe, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mark Fultz.(sshe, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9265236.), filed by Mark Fultz. Service due by 11/5/2020(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fultz v. Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raaj Kumar Hotel Investments LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Paige Brown
Represented By: Graham P Powell
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Represented By: Vanessa Ann Richardson
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?