Fultz v. Hospitality South LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Defendant: Hospitality South LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02987
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Riley Holmes on behalf of Hospitality South LLC (Holmes, Allan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Fultz. Hospitality South LLC served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Refiled to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user and to correct event type. (jbry, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion by Lawrence A. Fuller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/21/2020.(jbry, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A. Fuller ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9291024) by Mark Fultz. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Supporting Documents Report of the Referee)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Richardson, Vanessa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hospitality South LLC. (jbry, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mark Fultz.(jbry, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hospitality South LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9286821.), filed by Mark Fultz. Service due by 11/17/2020(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fultz v. Hospitality South LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fultz
Represented By: Vanessa Ann Richardson
Represented By: Lawrence Arthur Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality South LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Jane Wolfe
Represented By: Allan Riley Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?