Collins v. Cash America East Inc
Plaintiff: Christopher Collins
Defendant: Cash America East Inc doing business as Cash America Pawn
Case Number: 2:2020cv02989
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Amended Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Collins.(Kobrovsky, Lawrence) Modified on 10/15/2020 to reference attorney filed corrected document for typographical error (correct reference at 1. Answer: last sentence to "Defendant") per filing user(sshe, ).
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Collins.(Kobrovsky, Lawrence)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Cash America East Inc.(Lusk, Holly)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Christopher Collins.(Kobrovsky, Lawrence)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report by Christopher Collins. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, #2 Supporting Documents Mediation of Cases Pending before Judge Gergel)(Kobrovsky, Lawrence)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7,8 Reason: Discovery, Initial Disclosures per Rule 26(a)(1)(A) are not filed but exchanged between parties Filing date of original filing: 10/14/2020 (sshe, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Christopher Collins.(Kobrovsky, Lawrence)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/14/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/14/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/8/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/8/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/8/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2021, Discovery due by 3/8/2021, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Jury Selection and/or Trial Deadline on or after 7/1/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/9/2020. (sshe, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Cash America East Inc.(Lusk, Holly)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cash America East Inc.(sshe, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-03061. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9287084), filed by Cash America East Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Affidavits of Service, #3 State Court Documents State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Cash America East Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Lawrence Craig Kobrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash America East Inc doing business as Cash America Pawn
Represented By: Holly Michelle Lusk
Represented By: Douglas M Zayicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?