Expert IP LLC v. Twin Rivers Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Expert IP LLC doing business as AT-NET Services
Defendant: Twin Rivers Capital LLC and HJB Construction Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv03426
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without prejudice by Expert IP LLC. (Bach, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Deposit Funds. Plaintiff shall deposit monies the disposition of which is at issue in this case into the registry of the court in an interest bearing account, pending further order of the court. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/28/2020.(jbry, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds Under Rule 67 by Expert IP LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.(Bach, Adam)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Expert IP LLC. HJB Construction Inc served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020; Twin Rivers Capital LLC served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of service)(Bach, Adam)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Expert IP LLC.(jbry, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9368402.), filed by Expert IP LLC. Service due by 12/29/2020(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expert IP LLC v. Twin Rivers Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expert IP LLC doing business as AT-NET Services
Represented By: Adam Crittenden Bach
Represented By: Robert Hudson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Rivers Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HJB Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?